Cornell, Richard Anthony (CPSO#: 62154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
186 Erie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 4T3
Phone: (705) 445-0458
Fax: 705-445-2586
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Cornell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cornell ( CPSO# 62154 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
186 Erie Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 4T3
Phone Number: (705) 445-0458

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ANTHONY CORNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORNELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991