Cornelson, Brian Maynard (CPSO#: 27007)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 410 Sherbourne Street Toronto ON M4X 1K2
Date Received: 18 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016