Cornila, Angelica Marioara (CPSO#: 83494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
168 Essex Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 4R9
Phone: (519) 337-7535
Fax: (519) 337-7536
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Blue Water Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 464-4534
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.M. Cornila Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cornila ( CPSO# 83494 )

Business Address:
168 Essex Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 4R9
Phone Number: (519) 337-7535

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-4325

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELICA MARIOARA CORNILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORNILA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jul 2005 to 14 Aug 2005
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2006