Corpus, Rolando Tojino (CPSO#: 31415)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Apr 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4580 Dufferin Street
Suite 501
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y2
Phone: (416) 739-9123
Fax: (416) 739-1238
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Philippines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROLANDO TOJINO CORPUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORPUS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1980