Corpus, Teofilo (CPSO#: 69118)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3100
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 697-3607
Fax: (905) 697-3645
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Teofilo Corpus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Corpus ( CPSO# 69118 )

Business Address:
3100 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 697-3607

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TEOFILO CORPUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORPUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1998