Correa, Alethea Joan (CPSO#: 69117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Care Medical Clinic
1755 Brimley Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 0A3
Phone: (416) 290-0361
Fax: (416) 290-5986
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alethea J. Correa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Correa ( CPSO# 69117 )

Business Address:
One Care Medical Clinic
1755 Brimley Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 0A3
Phone Number: (416) 290-0361

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALETHEA JOAN CORREA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORREA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997