Corrigan, Gina Rita (CPSO#: 95275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Renfrew Family Health Team
117 Banting Drive
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Phone: (613) 584-1037
Fax: (613) 584-3107
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Sep 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GINA RITA CORRIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORRIGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2013