Corrin, Lesley Susan (CPSO#: 55319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
304
491 Lawrence Ave west
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 787-1775
Fax: (416) 787-3255
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1333 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Y9
Canada
Phone: 4162917719
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLEY SUSAN CORRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORRIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2013