Corriveau, Alphee Roland (CPSO#: 12156)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1943

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 01 Jan 1950 RCPSC Specialist
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1952 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1946
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1990