Corriveau, Marc Michel (CPSO#: 78682)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: French, Italian

Education:University of Montreal, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 15 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 19 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004