Corser, Sarah Alison (CPSO#: 81012)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: Ely, Sarah Alison (used until: 25 Jan 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 May 2007