Corsten, Martin John (CPSO#: 64951)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Corsten Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 19 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2015