Cortese, Leonardo (CPSO#: 58538)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Rome, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5111 Ext. 76970
Fax: (519) 257-5255
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Cortese Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Cortese ( CPSO# 58538 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace HealthCare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEONARDO CORTESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORTESE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1991