Corvo, Antoinette (CPSO#: 71079)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2431
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

the ottawa hospital
501 smyth road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Corvo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Corvo ( CPSO# 71079 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Anesthesiology
3348 - 401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2431

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTOINETTE CORVO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORVO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1999