Cory, Emma Jane (CPSO#: 75258)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: Wardle, Emma Jane (used until: 23 Mar 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6275
Fax: (416) 813-5846
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMMA JANE CORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2004