Costa, Alexandru Daniel (CPSO#: 56580)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 110 Building A
9100 Jane Street
Vaughan ON  L4K 0A4
Phone: (905) 482-4400
Fax: (905) 482-4400
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRU DANIEL COSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991