Costa, Maria Teresa De Jesus (CPSO#: 28463)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Genetics Effective: 06 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Mar 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998