Costache, Ioana (CPSO#: 69893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: (613) 737-8189
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Costache Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Thompson ( CPSO# 69015 )
Dr. I. Costache ( CPSO# 69893 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IOANA COSTACHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTACHE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2002