Costantini, Daniela Frances (CPSO#: 92867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: Villani, Daniela Frances (used until: 15 May 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9600 Bathurst Street, 3rd floor,
suite 300
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: (289) 269-1522
Fax: (905) 303-9773
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELA FRANCES COSTANTINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTANTINI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2014