Cot, Bianca (CPSO#: 86720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 997-4500
Fax: (905) 997-9100
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Lebovic Building Suite L5 027
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-8590
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Cot ( CPSO# 86720 )

Business Address:
Suite 408
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (416) 272-1113

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 13 Feb 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIANCA COT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2012