Cote, Andree (CPSO#: 57079)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2017