Cote Beck, Martin Edward John (CPSO#: 52728)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Beck, Martin Edward John (used until: 23 Aug 1998 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: PO Box 2019 901 5th Avenue Fernie, British Columbia V0B 1M0 Tel: (250) 423-5550 Fax: (888) 784-8121
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009