Cote, Genevieve Louise (CPSO#: 71666)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Family Medicine Clinic
Suite 100
2555 St Joseph Street
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: (613) 830-2170
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Genevieve Cote Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Cote ( CPSO# 71666 )

Business Address:
100 - 2555 St Joseph Street
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone Number: (613) 830-1298

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jan 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE LOUISE COTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 07 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2000