Cote, Gilles E. (CPSO#: 52475)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Mar 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
116 Boulevard Lionel-Emond
Gatineau-Hull QC  J8Y 1W7
Phone: (819) 966-6200 Ext. 6053
Fax: (819) 966-6081

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLES E. COTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1987