Cote, Isabelle (CPSO#: 56929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
691 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z4
Phone: (905) 524-2667
Fax: (905) 388-6861
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Isabelle Cote Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Cote ( CPSO# 56929 )

Business Address:
691 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z4
Phone Number: (905) 524-2667

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISABELLE COTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1986