Cote, Mylene (CPSO#: 94055)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-7000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mylene Cote Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cote ( CPSO# 94055 )

Business Address:
The Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 600-2683

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYLENE COTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014