Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cote, Sylvain Joseph (CPSO#: 64597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 671-5492
Fax: (705) 671-5458
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sylvain Cote Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cote ( CPSO# 64597 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 671-5492

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYLVAIN JOSEPH COTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1991