Cotter, Jill Erin (CPSO#: 76198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sandy Hill Community Health Centre
221 Nelson Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 1C7
Phone: (613) 789-8458
Fax: (613) 789-8710
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Aug 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JILL ERIN COTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COTTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2005