Couban, Stephen (CPSO#: 65645)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 19 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Sep 1997