Coughlan, Donald William Stewart (CPSO#: 55643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 408
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-6233
Fax: (905) 820-4947
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD WILLIAM STEWART COUGHLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COUGHLAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1990 to 31 Mar 1991
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987