Coughlin, Kevin Wayne (CPSO#: 72212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neonatal-Perinatal Med
Childrens Hospital at LHSC
PO Box 5010, Room D4 214
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 65925
Fax: (519) 646-6123
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. W. Coughlin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Coughlin ( CPSO# 72212 )

Business Address:
Division of Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Children's Hospital at LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite D4-214
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN WAYNE COUGHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COUGHLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2002