Coughlin, Larry Philip (CPSO#: 29124)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Sep 2001