Coulas, Denise Patti (CPSO#: 55688)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: Orr, Denise Patti (used until: 06 Oct 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
49 Mill Street
Killaloe ON  K0J 2A0
Phone: (613) 757-0004
Fax: (613) 757-0005
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1643 Mishomis Inamo
Golden Lake ON  K0J 1X0
Canada
Phone: 6136252259
Fax: 6136251124
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Denise P. Coulas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENISE PATTI COULAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COULAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987