Coulombe, Charles (CPSO#: 67213)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995