Coulombe, Rene Charles (CPSO#: 85597)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Emergency/Trauma Services
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6100
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. E. Poliakova ( CPSO# 95831 )
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. M. Twiddy ( CPSO# 95507 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. W. Neilipovitz ( CPSO# 61636 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000


Corporation Name: Rene Coulombe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences
Emergency/Trauma Services
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENE CHARLES COULOMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COULOMBE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006