Coulter, Diane Margaret (CPSO#: 65130)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 1997