Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Coupland, Ronald Steven (CPSO#: 62728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sioux Lookout First Nations
Health Authority
Primary Health Care Unit
P O Bag 4000
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1K9
Phone: (807) 737-5166
Fax: (807) 737-5089
Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD STEVEN COUPLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COUPLAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1992