Couroux, Peter Rolland (CPSO#: 59514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Inflamax Research
1310 Fewster Drive
Mississauga
Mississauga ON  L4W 1A4
Phone: (905) 282-1808
Fax: (905) 206-2690
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER ROLLAND COUROUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COUROUX is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1990
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1991