Courtney, Darren Bruce (CPSO#: 81164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction & Mental Hlth
Intergeneraltional Building
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: (416) 979-4996
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Darren Courtney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Courtney ( CPSO# 81164 )

Business Address:
Centre For Addiction & Mental Health
Intergeneraltional Building
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN BRUCE COURTNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COURTNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009