Cousineau, Natalie Janine (CPSO#: 82647)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46611
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. J. Cousineau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Cousineau ( CPSO# 82647 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE JANINE COUSINEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COUSINEAU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 14 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007