Cousins, Frances Nova (CPSO#: 82876)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Summerville FMTU
7th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-9900
Fax: (905) 272-9977
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Cousins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Cousins ( CPSO# 82876 )

Business Address:
Summerville FMTU
7th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCES NOVA COUSINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COUSINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007