Coutinho, Jude Jayaprakash Theo (CPSO#: 59527)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ministry of Health & Long Term Care
5700 Yonge Street
Fifth Floor
Toronto ON  M2M 4K2
Phone: (416) 314-7530
Fax: (416) 314-7538
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lambda Therapeutic Research Inc.
460 Comstock Road
Toronto ON  M1L 4S4
Phone: (416) 752-3636
Fax: (416) 752-7610
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. JUDE JAYAPRAKASH THEO COUTINHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COUTINHO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989