Coutts, John Robertson (CPSO#: 55625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2943 Major MacKenzie Dr. Unit 9
Maple ON  L6A 3N9
Phone: (905) 303-4657
Fax: (905) 303-3708
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

825 Don Mills Rd
Toronto ON  M3C 1V4
Canada
Phone: (416) 383-1251
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERTSON COUTTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COUTTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1985 to 15 Jun 1986
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2004