Couturaud, Francis Pierre Marcel (CPSO#: 73274)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universite Pierre et Marie Curie, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Apr 2000
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2000