Couture, Felix (CPSO#: 61398)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 May 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 May 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 10 May 1999 to 30 May 1999
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 1999