Couture, Sophie Marie-Pierre (CPSO#: 76268)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
65 Preswick Close
Halifax NS  B3S 0C1
Phone: (902) 429-2722
Fax: (902) 446-3038

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOPHIE MARIE-PIERRE COUTURE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COUTURE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2004 to 31 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2004