Covalcic, Catalina (CPSO#: 97180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Cluj, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Hospitalist Medicine
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2333
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Catalina Covalcic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Covalcic ( CPSO# 97180 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jan 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Oct 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2013 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Catalina  Covalcic  may  practise medicine independently in internal
                  medicine, only.