Cowan, Christopher John (CPSO#: 60712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone: (519) 753-8666
Fax: (519) 753-6880
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Downie, Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Thompson ( CPSO# 54979 )
Dr. C. Roye ( CPSO# 61763 )
Dr. D. Lowcock ( CPSO# 30284 )
Dr. D. Downie ( CPSO# 64176 )
Dr. K. Bates ( CPSO# 50121 )
Dr. C. Cowan ( CPSO# 60712 )

Business Address:
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Cowan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cowan ( CPSO# 60712 )

Business Address:
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN COWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1990