Cowan, David Donald (CPSO#: 62780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Centre for
Ambulatory Health Services
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone: (905) 573-4804
Fax: (905) 573-4820
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David D. Cowan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cowan ( CPSO# 62780 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare - King Campus
Suite 2501
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-4804

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 768-3311

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID DONALD COWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1993