Cowan, Ian Graham (CPSO#: 61809)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Dec 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone: (705) 495-2685
Fax: (705) 495-4128
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Cowan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Cowan ( CPSO# 61809 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
66 Josephine Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A7
Phone Number: (705) 495-2685

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN GRAHAM COWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1989